Mimish, Layth Ahmad (CPSO#: 57565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HD Medical Consultant Clinic
Medical Director
Senior Consultant Cardiologist
Jeddah 21491
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +96612-6060666
Fax: +96612-6066057

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAYTH AHMAD MIMISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIMISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 02 Feb 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Feb 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2014