Min, Jason Kee (CPSO#: 81092)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Min Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Ottawa Fertility Centre 955 Green Valley Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2C 3V4
Date Received: 05 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011