Min, Jie (CPSO#: 96508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland McMaster Family Health Team
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 734-9699
Fax: (905) 734-3947
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carle and Dr. Min Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Min ( CPSO# 96508 )
Dr. D. Carle ( CPSO# 95069 )

Business Address:
Welland McMaster Family Health Team
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 734-9699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIE MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013