Min, Simon Taiki (CPSO#: 62508)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 1999