Min, Soh-Yoon (CPSO#: 84567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Korean

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room 3G 103
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905)521-7978
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Min ( CPSO# 84567 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Suite 3G-103
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOH-YOON MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 17 May 2011 to 16 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 17 May 2012 to 16 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 17 May 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013