Min, Trisha Jaeeun (CPSO#: 103299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellmedica
7600 Weston Road Unit 55
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: (855) 371-3500
Fax: (289) 371-3330
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trisha Jaeeun Min Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Min ( CPSO# 103299)

Business Address:
Wellmedica
Suite 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone Number: (855) 371-3500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA JAEEUN MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016