Minas, Tommy (CPSO#: 51207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cartilage Repair Center
Suite 112
850 Boylston Street
Chestnut Hill MA  02467
United States
Phone: (617) 732-9967
Fax: (617) 732-9272

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMMY MINAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1983