Minassian, Berge Arakel (CPSO#: 65581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Ave. West
Ste 503
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-9197
Fax: (905) 820-9160
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERGE ARAKEL MINASSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINASSIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Comprehensive - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993