Minassian, Vicken (CPSO#: 70852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003