Minde, Klaus Karl (CPSO#: 26137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2009