Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mingo, Nancy Sabina (CPSO#: 63920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: 416 971-2089
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Mingo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mingo ( CPSO# 63920 )

Business Address:
214 College Street
Suite 232
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 978-8030

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638
Date Received: 11 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY SABINA MINGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINGO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992