Minhas, Avinder Singh (CPSO#: 51208)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008