Minhas, Kuldip Singh (CPSO#: 61872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Kerala, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6265
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 502-9900
Fax: (416) 502-9905
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Minhas ( CPSO# 61872 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6265

Business Address:
Suite 332
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULDIP SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997