Minich, Peter John (CPSO#: 58589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3803 north 36th st
tacoma WA  98407
United States
Phone: (253) 697 3333

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN MINICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1989