Minielly, John Andrew (CPSO#: 19330)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995