Minkowitz, Joseph (CPSO#: 55932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-7357
Fax: (905) 472-9206
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Stouffville Nuclear and
Cardiac Imaging
28 Sandiford Dr
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 640-7100
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Minkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Minkowitz ( CPSO# 55932 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
110 Coppercreek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-7357


Corporation Name: Hacker Minkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Minkowitz ( CPSO# 55932 )
Dr. P. Hacker ( CPSO# 56774 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MINKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986