Minna, Roberta (CPSO#: 68135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Surgery and Endoscopy
Suite 302
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-1905
Fax: (416) 746-9437
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 209
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 749-9444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Minna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Minna ( CPSO# 68135 )

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 746-1905

Business Address:
Suite 209
40 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 749-9444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA MINNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999