Mintsioulis, Stephen John George (CPSO#: 85356)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 14 Jul 2006 to 11 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Aug 2006 to 26 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2006