Minty, Bryanne (CPSO#: 101316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Superior Family Health Group
P7A 4Z6
470-63N Algoma St
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryanne Minty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Minty ( CPSO# 101316)

Business Address:
Suite 470
4th Floor
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 344-8475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYANNE MINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015