Mintz, Arlan Harold Pinzer (CPSO#: 62568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capital Health
Capital Institute of Neurosciences
Two Capital Way
Pennington, New Jersey
Pennington NJ  08534
United States
Phone: (609) 537-7300
Fax: (609) 537-7301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARLAN HAROLD PINZER MINTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991