Minuk, Earl Sheldon (CPSO#: 55616)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1989