Minuzzi, Luciano (CPSO#: 96960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Psychiatry and Behavioural
Neurosciences
100 West 5th Street - Room C122
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35499
Fax: 905-381-5629
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Minuzzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Minuzzi ( CPSO# 96960 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioural Neuroscie
100 West 5th Street
Room C122
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2011 to 02 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 03 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Luciano Minuzzi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry  and  Behavioural  Neurosciences,  Division  of  General
                        Psychiatry,  McMaster  University,  in which Dr.  Minuzzi holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Minuzzi  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Minuzzi's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Minuzzi's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on April 1, 2013, and expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal  of  Dr.  Minuzzi's  academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.