Mir Mohamed, Uwais (CPSO#: 82139)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 15 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006