Miranda Hermosilla, Victor Andres (CPSO#: 87667)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad de La Frontera, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2007 to 22 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2010