Miron, Mary Michele (CPSO#: 68919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2434
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Michele Miron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miron ( CPSO# 68919 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MICHELE MIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004