Miroshnichenko, Gennady Gennadyevich (CPSO#: 88086)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tyumen State Medical Academy, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Feb 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012