Mirtorabi, Nima (CPSO#: 87546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

883 Mulock Dr. Unit 5B
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-3825
Fax: (905) 235-3942
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirtorabi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mirtorabi ( CPSO# 87546 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone Number: (905) 640-3100

Business Address:
5B - 883 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone Number: (905) 235-3825

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMA MIRTORABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRTORABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009