Mirza, Hunaina Farhat (CPSO#: 93930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vital Care Medical
Unit 5B
883 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone: (905) 235-3825
Fax: (905) 235-3942
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hunaina Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mirza ( CPSO# 93930 )

Business Address:
23550 Woodbine Avenue
Keswick ON  L4P 3E9
Phone Number: (905) 476-7330

Business Address:
Vital Care Medical
5B - 883 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone Number: (905) 235-3825

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUNAINA FARHAT MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013