Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mis, Andrew Alexander (CPSO#: 60391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manitoba Clinic
790 Sherbrook Street, Room 104
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1M3
Phone: (204) 788-5729
Fax: (204) 784-4128
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Misericordia Health Centre
99 Cornish Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3C 1A2
Canada
Phone: (204) 788-8590
Fax: (204) 786-0809
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ALEXANDER MIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992