Misho, Raghad Rita Ramzi Hanna (CPSO#: 79698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: Hanna, Raghad Ramzi (used until: 03 Apr 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tuscany Medical Centre
Building A , Suite 105
9100 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Phone: (905) 760-1140
Fax: (905) 760-5587
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAGHAD RITA RAMZI HANNA MISHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005