Mishra, Amrita (CPSO#: 86909)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Utkal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012