Mishra, Ashok (CPSO#: 51212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Church Street Consulting Suites
Suite 19
140 Church Street
Richmond 3121
Australia
Phone: 0394201465
Fax: 0394216732

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK MISHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985