Mishra, Sharmistha (CPSO#: 77964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St.Michael's Hospital
4th floor, Suite 4179, CC Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5746
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARMISTHA MISHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006