Misiaszek, Brian Christopher (CPSO#: 71425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre For Healthy Aging
St Peters Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837 Ext. 74132
Fax: (905) 526-2062
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misiaszek & King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Misiaszek ( CPSO# 71425 )
Dr. C. King ( CPSO# 70164 )

Business Address:
Centre for Healthy Aging
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Suite 105
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 628-5656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CHRISTOPHER MISIASZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISIASZEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002