Misir, Amita Tanya Raha (CPSO#: 84770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Raha, Amita Tanya (used until: 31 May 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre VH
Room E4-211
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8134
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Misir ( CPSO# 81046 )
Dr. A. Misir ( CPSO# 84770 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre VH
Room E4-211
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8134

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMITA TANYA RAHA MISIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010