Miskin, Murray (CPSO#: 19303)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murray Miskin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Oxford Medical Imaging 55 York Street Toronto ON M5J 1R7 Mississauga Ultrasound 71 King Street West Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016