Missiha, Sharif Bishara (CPSO#: 79445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 725-1596
Fax: (905) 725-3900
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Lakeridge Health Network
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharif Missiha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Missiha ( CPSO# 79445 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Health Centre
Suite 301
247 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone Number: (905) 725-1596

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARIF BISHARA MISSIHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISSIHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007