Misterski, Jacek Edward (CPSO#: 56695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201B
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 836-0409
Fax: (519) 836-0064
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacek Misterski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Misterski ( CPSO# 56695 )

Business Address:
201B - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 836-0409

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACEK EDWARD MISTERSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISTERSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989