Mistry, Dalpatbhai Bhagabhai (CPSO#: 51422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
4A
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4411
Fax: (905) 721-4742
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalpat B. Mistry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mistry ( CPSO# 51422 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 516-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALPATBHAI BHAGABHAI MISTRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISTRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986