Mistry, Gunvantrai Dajibhai (CPSO#: 58490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KW Urgent Care
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 745-2273
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gunvantrai Mistry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mistry ( CPSO# 58490 )

Business Address:
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone Number: (519) 893-5117

Business Address:
KW Urgent Care
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 748-2542

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services, 1 (888) 563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 11 Jul 2016

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUNVANTRAI DAJIBHAI MISTRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISTRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988