Mitchell, Bryan Fraser (CPSO#: 26334)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1987