Mitchell, Clare Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanitorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Fax: (519) 858-9789
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE ELIZABETH MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1989