Mitchell, David Arnold (CPSO#: 21346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 463-4037
Fax: (416) 463-4031
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARNOLD MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968