Mitchell, Jacqueline Ruth Joan (CPSO#: 58246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
9780 Bramalea Road North
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone: (905) 791-2390
Fax: (905) 791-8476
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE RUTH JOAN MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1989