Mitchell, Marianna Kristina (CPSO#: 60669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Medical Center
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 665-9001
Fax: (905) 665-9335
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa
Ontario
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 3578
Fax: 905-721-7774
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marianna Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mitchell ( CPSO# 60669 )

Business Address:
Dundas Medical Center
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNA KRISTINA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991