Mitchell, Theodore Wallace (CPSO#: 68233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 Locke St. South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Phone: (905) 570-0440
Fax: (905) 570-0545
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell and Talman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talman ( CPSO# 65195 )
Dr. T. Mitchell ( CPSO# 68233 )

Business Address:
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Phone Number: (905) 570-0440

Business Address:
HGH 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE WALLACE MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996