Mitchell, Wade Robert (CPSO#: 76681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
150 St Paul Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3P2
Phone: (705) 445-2827 Ext. 2
Fax: (705) 445-1671
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wade R. Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mitchell ( CPSO# 76681 )

Business Address:
102 - 150 St. Paul's Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3P2
Phone Number: (705) 445-2827

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADE ROBERT MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010