Miyanji, Firoz (CPSO#: 78858)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2003 to 10 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2005