Miyasaka, Katsuyuki (CPSO#: 45990)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shinshu University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000