Miyasaki, Janis Mari (CPSO#: 59640)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miyasaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014